LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB604
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB604
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB604
Compare Versions
AB604 Chaptered April 28, 2010
AB604 Enrolled April 26, 2010
AB604 Amended March 24, 2010
AB604 Amended September 1, 2009
AB604 Amended May 5, 2009
AB604 Amended April 22, 2009
AB604 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB604 Chaptered April 28, 2010
AB604 Enrolled April 26, 2010
AB604 Amended March 24, 2010
AB604 Amended September 1, 2009
AB604 Amended May 5, 2009
AB604 Amended April 22, 2009
AB604 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare