|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 366, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 2980.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2069.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on F. & A.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on F. & A. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1847.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 15). From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|