LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB606
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB606
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB606
Compare Versions
AB606 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB606 Enrolled September 9, 2009
AB606 Amended August 26, 2009
AB606 Amended August 17, 2009
AB606 Amended July 15, 2009
AB606 Amended June 22, 2009
AB606 Amended April 16, 2009
AB606 Amended April 2, 2009
AB606 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB606 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB606 Enrolled September 9, 2009
AB606 Amended August 26, 2009
AB606 Amended August 17, 2009
AB606 Amended July 15, 2009
AB606 Amended June 22, 2009
AB606 Amended April 16, 2009
AB606 Amended April 2, 2009
AB606 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare