|
09/10/2009
|
Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Page 2380.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (September 10). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 5.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 31. Page 2067.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2008
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 9.
|
|
|
|
12/09/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|