LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB64
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB64
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB64
Compare Versions
AB64 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB64 Amended September 11, 2009
AB64 Amended September 10, 2009
AB64 Amended June 23, 2009
AB64 Amended May 6, 2009
AB64 Amended April 15, 2009
AB64 Amended March 24, 2009
AB64 Amended March 18, 2009
AB64 Introduced December 9, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB64 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB64 Amended September 11, 2009
AB64 Amended September 10, 2009
AB64 Amended June 23, 2009
AB64 Amended May 6, 2009
AB64 Amended April 15, 2009
AB64 Amended March 24, 2009
AB64 Amended March 18, 2009
AB64 Introduced December 9, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare