|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2982.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 2052.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected July 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1628.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|