California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB644 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 19, 2009
Bill June 25, 2009
Bill June 9, 2009
Bill May 7, 2009