|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 439, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6522.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4704.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1765.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|