LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB655
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB655
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB655
Compare Versions
AB655 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB655 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB655 Amended August 18, 2010
AB655 Amended August 2, 2010
AB655 Amended May 20, 2010
AB655 Amended May 19, 2009
AB655 Amended April 16, 2009
AB655 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB655 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB655 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB655 Amended August 18, 2010
AB655 Amended August 2, 2010
AB655 Amended May 20, 2010
AB655 Amended May 19, 2009
AB655 Amended April 16, 2009
AB655 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare