|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 251, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3265.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2291.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1466.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|