California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB669 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 669CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 251 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 10, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fong (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Portantino) (Principal coauthor: Senator Liu) FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to add Section 68085 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 669, Fong. Postsecondary education: residency requirements. Existing law establishes the segments of public postsecondary education in the state, including the University of California, the California State University, and the California Community Colleges. Existing law establishes uniform residency requirements for purposes of ascertaining the amount of fees to be paid by students. Existing law establishes various exceptions to these uniform residency requirements, including, but not limited to, exceptions for a student who has been entirely self-supporting and actually present in California for more than one year immediately preceding the residence determination date, as specified, and for a student who is a full-time employee of an institution or of any state agency who is assigned to work outside of the state. This bill would allow an exception to the uniform residency requirements for a student 19 years of age or under at the time of enrollment, who resides in California and is a dependent or ward of the state through California's child welfare system, or was served by California's child welfare system and is no longer being served either due to emancipation or aging out of the system. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 68085 is added to the Education Code, to read: 68085. A student who currently resides in California and is 19 years of age or under at the time of enrollment, who is currently a dependent or ward of the state through California's child welfare system, or was served by California's child welfare system and is no longer being served either due to emancipation or aging out of the system, may be entitled to resident classification until he or she has resided in the state the minimum time necessary to become a resident.