|
02/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 54. Noes 12. Page 3910.)
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 2334.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 1735.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|