LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB680
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB680
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB680
Compare Versions
AB680 Chaptered February 9, 2010
AB680 Enrolled January 28, 2010
AB680 Amended June 22, 2009
AB680 Amended May 19, 2009
AB680 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB680 Chaptered February 9, 2010
AB680 Enrolled January 28, 2010
AB680 Amended June 22, 2009
AB680 Amended May 19, 2009
AB680 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare