|
09/03/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 2046.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|