LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB682
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB682
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB682
Compare Versions
AB682 Amended September 3, 2009
AB682 Amended June 30, 2009
AB682 Amended June 1, 2009
AB682 Amended April 30, 2009
AB682 Amended April 16, 2009
AB682 Amended March 26, 2009
AB682 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB682 Amended September 3, 2009
AB682 Amended June 30, 2009
AB682 Amended June 1, 2009
AB682 Amended April 30, 2009
AB682 Amended April 16, 2009
AB682 Amended March 26, 2009
AB682 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare