|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 2996.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 2073.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 1343.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 1220.).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|