California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB692 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2009

Amended

Bill August 26, 2009
Bill July 16, 2009
Bill May 4, 2009
Bill April 2, 2009