California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB819 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill August 12, 2010
Bill August 3, 2010
Bill June 22, 2010
Bill July 9, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill May 6, 2009
Bill April 15, 2009