LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB819
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB819
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB819
Compare Versions
AB819 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB819 Enrolled August 24, 2010
AB819 Amended August 12, 2010
AB819 Amended August 3, 2010
AB819 Amended June 22, 2010
AB819 Amended July 9, 2009
AB819 Amended June 1, 2009
AB819 Amended May 6, 2009
AB819 Amended April 15, 2009
AB819 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB819 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB819 Enrolled August 24, 2010
AB819 Amended August 12, 2010
AB819 Amended August 3, 2010
AB819 Amended June 22, 2010
AB819 Amended July 9, 2009
AB819 Amended June 1, 2009
AB819 Amended May 6, 2009
AB819 Amended April 15, 2009
AB819 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare