|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3285.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2314.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1988.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/24/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 23.
|
|
|
|
12/23/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|