California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB82 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 23, 2008

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2009

Amended

Bill September 2, 2009
Bill August 17, 2009
Bill June 25, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill April 14, 2009