LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB823
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB823
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB823
Compare Versions
AB823 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB823 Amended September 1, 2009
AB823 Amended July 14, 2009
AB823 Amended June 24, 2009
AB823 Amended June 2, 2009
AB823 Amended April 20, 2009
AB823 Amended March 31, 2009
AB823 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB823 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB823 Amended September 1, 2009
AB823 Amended July 14, 2009
AB823 Amended June 24, 2009
AB823 Amended June 2, 2009
AB823 Amended April 20, 2009
AB823 Amended March 31, 2009
AB823 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare