BILL NUMBER: AB 823ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 14, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 24, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 2, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hill (Coauthors: Assembly Members Jeffries, Nestande, and Solorio) FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to amend Section 44062.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 823, Hill. Smog check: vehicle repair assistance. Existing law establishes a motor vehicle inspection and maintenance (smog check) program, developed, implemented, and administered by the Department of Consumer Affairs. The duty of enforcing and administering the program is vested in the Chief of the Bureau of Automotive Repair within the department. Existing law provides for a repair assistance program available to an individual whose maximum income level is 185% of the federal poverty level, or 225% of the federal poverty level if a certain determination is made, and who is the owner of a motor vehicle that has failed a smog check inspection or received a notice to correct, or an individual who has failed a smog check inspection and is directed to a test-only facility. This bill would make the repair assistance program available only to low-income individuals whose income does not exceed 225% of the federal poverty level, as specified. The bill would make other conforming changes, and delete obsolete provisions of law. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 44062.1 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 44062.1. (a) The department shall offer a repair assistance program through entities authorized to perform referee functions. (b) (1) The repair assistance program shall be available to an individual who is a low-income motor vehicle owner, and who is either or both of the following: (A) The owner of a motor vehicle that has failed a smog check inspection. (B) The owner of a motor vehicle who was issued a notice to correct for an alleged violation of Section 27153 or 27153.5 of the Vehicle Code involving that vehicle, if the vehicle subject to that notice has failed a smog check inspection subsequent to receiving the notice. (2) The department shall offer repair cost assistance to individuals based on the cost-effectiveness and air quality benefit of the needed repair. Repair assistance may include retesting costs and the costs of repairs to remedy the violation of Section 27153 or 27153.5 of the Vehicle Code. (3) An applicant for repair assistance shall file an application on a form prescribed by the department, and shall certify under penalty of perjury that the applicant meets the applicable eligibility standards. (4) Verification of income eligibility shall be based on at least one form of documentation, as determined by the department, including, but not limited to, (A) an income tax return, (B) an employment warrant, or (C) a form of public assistance verification. (c) The repair assistance program shall be funded by the High Polluter Repair or Removal Account. (d) Repairs to motor vehicles that fail smog check inspections and are subsidized by the state through the program shall be performed at a repair station licensed and certified pursuant to Sections 44014 and 44014.2. Repairs shall be based upon a preapproved list of repairs for cost-effective emission reductions or repairs to remedy a violation of Section 27153 or 27153.5 of the Vehicle Code. (e) The qualified low-income motor vehicle owner receiving repair assistance pursuant to this section shall contribute a copayment, as determined by the department, either in cash, or in emissions-related partial repairs as verified by a test-only station pursuant to paragraph (2) of subdivision (c) of Section 44015, or a combination thereof. If the repair cost exceeds the applicable repair cost limit, the department shall inform a motor vehicle owner of all options for compliance at the time of testing and repair. (f) The department may increase its contribution toward the repair of a motor vehicle under this program in excess of the amount authorized for the repair of a high polluter pursuant to paragraph (1) of subdivision (b) of Section 44094, if the department determines that the expenditure is cost effective. In determining the cost-effectiveness of the expenditure, the department shall consider a failure of the visible smoke test, pursuant to Section 44012.1, and the costs associated with repairing a smoking vehicle. (g) The department shall collect data from the program to provide information to develop recommendations to improve the program. Data collection shall include all of the following: (1) The number of motor vehicle owners that are eligible for repair assistance. (2) The number of eligible motor vehicle owners that use repair assistance funds. (3) The potential for fraud. (4) The average repair bills. (5) The types of repairs being done. (6) The amount of partial repairs done prior to receipt of repair assistance. (7) The emissions benefits of providing repair assistance. (h) For purposes of this section, "low-income motor vehicle owner" means a person whose income does not exceed 225 percent of the federal poverty level, as published quarterly in the Federal Register by the United States Department of Health and Human Services.