|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2262.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1377.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 556.)
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 3).
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/24/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 23.
|
|
|
|
12/23/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|