LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB83
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB83
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB83
Compare Versions
AB83 Chaptered August 6, 2009
AB83 Enrolled June 26, 2009
AB83 Amended June 15, 2009
AB83 Amended May 6, 2009
AB83 Amended March 5, 2009
AB83 Amended February 26, 2009
AB83 Amended February 5, 2009
AB83 Introduced December 23, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB83 Chaptered August 6, 2009
AB83 Enrolled June 26, 2009
AB83 Amended June 15, 2009
AB83 Amended May 6, 2009
AB83 Amended March 5, 2009
AB83 Amended February 26, 2009
AB83 Amended February 5, 2009
AB83 Introduced December 23, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare