|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 63. Noes 11. Page 6636.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4496.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Maldonado.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 1734.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|