California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB909 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/31/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 909ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 12, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 3, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hill FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to amend Section 21453 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 909, Hill. Vehicles: right turn violations. Existing law requires a driver facing a steady circular red signal alone to stop at a marked limit line, but if none, before entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection or, if none, then before entering the intersection, and to remain stopped until an indication to proceed is shown, except as specified. A violation of this provision is an infraction punishable by a fine of $100. Existing law authorizes a driver who is facing a steady circular red signal, after stopping as required, to turn right or turn left from a one-way street onto a one-way street, except when a sign is in place prohibiting a turn. A violation of this provision is generally punishable by a fine of up to $100. This bill would recast these provisions. The bill would instead prohibit the driver stopped at the red signal pursuant to these provisions from proceeding straight through the intersection or making a left turn, except a left turn from a one-way street onto a one-way street, until an indication to proceed is shown, a violation of which would be punishable by a fine of $100. The bill would authorize a driver stopped at a red signal pursuant to these provisions to turn right, or turn left from a one-way street onto a one-way street, except when a sign is in place prohibiting the turn, a violation of which would be punishable by a fine of up to $100. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 21453 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 21453. (a) A driver facing a steady circular red signal alone shall stop at a marked limit line, but if none, before entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection or, if none, then before entering the intersection, and may not proceed straight through the intersection or turn left, except a left turn from a one-way street onto a one-way street, until an indication to proceed is shown. (b) A driver facing a steady circular red signal alone shall stop at a marked limit line, but if none, before entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection or, if none, then before entering the intersection, and may turn right, or turn left from a one-way street onto a one-way street, except when a sign is in place prohibiting the turn. A driver making the turn shall yield the right-of-way to pedestrians lawfully within an adjacent crosswalk and to any vehicle that has approached or is approaching so closely as to constitute an immediate hazard to the driver, and shall continue to yield the right-of-way to that vehicle until the driver can proceed with reasonable safety. (c) A driver facing a steady red arrow signal shall not enter the intersection to make the movement indicated by the arrow and, unless entering the intersection to make a movement permitted by another signal, shall stop at a clearly marked limit line, but if none, before entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection, or if none, then before entering the intersection, and shall remain stopped until an indication permitting movement is shown. (d) Unless otherwise directed by a pedestrian control signal as provided in Section 21456, a pedestrian facing a steady circular red or red arrow signal shall not enter the roadway.