|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2537.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 1669.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1174.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|