LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB96
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB96
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB96
Compare Versions
AB96 Chaptered August 6, 2009
AB96 Enrolled July 17, 2009
AB96 Amended July 1, 2009
AB96 Amended June 15, 2009
AB96 Amended April 21, 2009
AB96 Amended March 26, 2009
AB96 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB96 Chaptered August 6, 2009
AB96 Enrolled July 17, 2009
AB96 Amended July 1, 2009
AB96 Amended June 15, 2009
AB96 Amended April 21, 2009
AB96 Amended March 26, 2009
AB96 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare