California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB97 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 19, 2009
Bill July 23, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill April 14, 2009