LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB97
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB97
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB97
Compare Versions
AB97 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB97 Amended August 20, 2010
AB97 Amended August 19, 2009
AB97 Amended July 23, 2009
AB97 Amended June 1, 2009
AB97 Amended April 14, 2009
AB97 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB97 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB97 Amended August 20, 2010
AB97 Amended August 19, 2009
AB97 Amended July 23, 2009
AB97 Amended June 1, 2009
AB97 Amended April 14, 2009
AB97 Introduced January 6, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare