|
05/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2038.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|