BILL NUMBER: AB 970AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 27, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Block and Bass Member Block ( Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Brownley, Carter, Eng, Miller, Nestande, and Solorio ) FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to add Section 51204.7 to the Education Code, relating to public schools. An act relating to economic development. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 970, as amended, Block. Curriculum and instructional materials: Native Americans. Local government: economic development. Existing law includes various programs to facilitate economic development at the local level, including the Community Redevelopment Law and the Enterprise Zone Act. (1) This bill establish the University Park and Research Educational and Technological Fund, authorize the City of Chula Vista to collect private moneys for deposit in the fund and allocate any moneys in the fund to make loans to, or donations for, businesses or educational institutions within, or with the intent to locate within, the University Park and Research Center. The bill would provide that the city administer and oversee the fund. The bill would also provide that moneys deposited in the fund only be used for specified purposes. (2) The bill would establish the University Park and Research Center Educational and Technological Tax Credit Program. Under that program, a taxpayer would be granted a credit, as specified, for a period of no more than 7 years, against the taxpayer's state corporation tax or state personal income tax liability, on the amount invested in businesses or educational institutions within, or with the intent to locate within, the University Park and Research Center, during the taxable year. (3) This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the City of Chula Vista. Existing law requires that, when adopting instructional materials for use in the schools, governing boards shall include only instructional materials that, in their determination, accurately portray the cultural and racial diversity of our society, including the role and contributions of Native Americans to the total development of California and the United States. Existing law also requires that instruction in social sciences include the early history of California and a study of the role and contributions of American Indians to the economic, political, and social development of California and the United States of America, with particular emphasis on portraying the role of these groups in contemporary society. This bill would encourage the State Board of Education and the Curriculum Development and Supplemental Materials Commission to ensure that the history-social science framework, evaluation criteria, and instructional materials include information about American Indians. The bill would require the state board, within one year following the conclusion of the first adoption cycle for history-social science instructional materials that occurs on or after January 1, 2010, to report to the Legislature and the Governor regarding the progress of achieving the goals set forth by the bill. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. For purposes of this act, "University Park and Research Center" means an area encompassing up to approximately 375 acres owned by, and wholly located within the geographic boundaries of, the City of Chula Vista. SEC. 2. (a) This act does all of the following: (1) Establishes the University Park and Research Center Educational and Technological Fund. (2) Authorizes the City of Chula Vista to collect private moneys for deposit in the fund. (3) Authorize the City of Chula Vista to allocate any moneys in the fund to make loans to, or donations for, businesses or educational institutions within, or the intent to locate within, the University Park and Research Center. (b) Upon deciding to carryout this act, the city shall administer and oversee the fund and work to achieve the best possible returns, with the lowest possible risk, on any loan made with moneys allocated from the fund. (c) Moneys deposited in the fund shall only be used to make loans to, or donations for, business or educational institutions within, or with the intent to locate within, the University Park and Research Center and to cover the costs of administering the fund. SEC. 3. (a) There is hereby established the University Park and Research Center Educational and Technological Tax Credit Program to facilitate economic development within the University Park and Research Center in the City of Chula Vista. Under the program, the Franchise Tax Board shall authorize a taxpayer to claim either of the following credits, for a period of no more than seven years. (b) (1) For each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2011, there shall be allowed as a credit against the amount of "net tax," as defined in Section 17039 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, an amount equal to 5 percent of the amount, as certified by the city based on substantial evidence on the record, invested in businesses or educational institutions within, or with the intent to locate within, the University Park and Research Center during the taxable year. (2) Notwithstanding paragraph (1), in the fourth, fifth, sixth, or seventh years that a taxpayer claims the credit, the amount of the credit shall be equal to 6 percent. (c) (1) For each taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2011, there shall be allowed as a credit against the amount of "tax," as defined in Section 23036 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, an amount equal to 5 percent of the amount, as certified by the city based on substantial evidence on the record, invested in businesses or educational institutions within, or with the intent to locate within, the University Park and Research Center during the taxable year. (2) Notwithstanding paragraph (1), in the fourth, fifth, sixth, or seventh years that a taxpayer claims the credit, the amount of the credit shall be equal to 6 percent. SEC. 4. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the City of Chula Vista's unique regional location and readiness to begin immediate development of an area designated as the University Park and Research Center that will serve California's economic needs for more college graduates, research and development in biotechnology and green energy, job creation and growth, in an area that is in the 11th highest foreclosure rate in the country and where 70 percent of the homes on the market (East Lake, Chula Vista) are the result of foreclosure. SECTION 1. Section 51204.7 is added to the Education Code, to read: 51204.7. (a) The State Board of Education and the Curriculum Development and Supplemental Materials Commission are encouraged to ensure that the history-social science framework, evaluation criteria, and instructional materials, adopted in the course of the next submission cycle following the date on which this section becomes effective, include information about American Indians, emphasizing California Native Americans, including their existing tribal and sovereign governments and their relationship with the California state government and the people of California. (b) Within one year following the conclusion of the first adoption cycle for history-social science instructional materials that occurs on or after January 1, 2010, the state board shall report to the Legislature and the Governor regarding the progress of achieving the goals set forth in this section.