|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3916.)
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 5).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 4). Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3672.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|