California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB978 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 01/26/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 978AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 26, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member V. Manuel Perez FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to add Section 11547.5 to the Government Code, relating to the State Chief Information Officer. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 978, as amended, V. Manuel Perez. State Chief Information Officer: duties. Existing law requires the State Chief Information Officer, until January 1, 2013, to work to improve organizational maturity and capacity in the effective management of information technology, and to establish performance management and improvement processes to ensure state information technology systems and services are efficient and effective. This bill would require the State Chief Information Officer to  develop an online master application for businesses to file for state permits and licenses, and work in collaboration with other state agencies to accomplish this duty   collaborate with the Department of Consumer Affairs to acquire a new, integrated, enterprise-wide enforcement and licensing system, as described, that will replace the current licensing   and monitoring system being used by the department  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) California's dominance in many economic areas is based, in part, on the significant role small businesses play in the state's $1.8 trillion economy. Businesses with less than 100 employees comprise more than 98.3 percent of all businesses and are responsible for employing more than 57.9 percent of all workers in the state. (b) Small businesses function as economic engines, especially in challenging economic times. During the nation's economic downturn from 1999 to 2003, microenterprises (businesses with less than five employees) created 318,183 new jobs or 77 percent of all employment growth, while larger businesses with more than 50 employees lost over 444,000 jobs. (c) Regulatory burdens and costs continue to be a major concern for small businesses. For the last 10 years, the federal Small Business Administration has conducted a study that analyzes the costs of federal government regulations on businesses. This research shows that small businesses continue to bear a disproportionate share of the federal regulatory burden. On a  per employee   per-employee  basis, it costs about two thousand four hundred dollars ($2,400), or 45 percent, more for small firms to comply with federal regulations than their larger counterparts. (d) While the specific financial impact of state regulations on small businesses is unknown, state agencies are required to consider the costs of adopting regulations on the California economy, in general, and on small business, specifically. (e) Given these difficult economic times for small businesses, it is fair and appropriate to expend resources to reduce the cost of applying for  state administered   state-administered  licenses and permits by developing an online master application.  SEC. 2.   Section 11547.5 is added to the Government Code, to read: 11547.5. (a) The State Chief Information Officer shall develop an online master application for businesses to file for state permits and licenses, and work in collaboration with the Secretary of State and the Secretary of Consumer Services to accomplish this duty. The State Chief Information Officer may delegate the development of the actual application to an appropriate state agency. (b) The State Chief Information Officer shall do all of the following: (1) Establish the requirements for the initiation of the information technology project. (2) Define the resource requirements and proposed technical solution that is in compliance with statewide strategies, policies, and procedures. (3) Consult with state agencies during the initial project planning to ensure that project proposals are based on well-defined programmatic needs, clearly identify programmatic benefits, and consider feasible alternatives to address the identified needs of businesses that apply for multiple state licenses and permits over a period of time. (4) Work with the Secretary of State and the Secretary of Consumer Services to ensure that boards and commissions have the appropriate technical assistance to use and maintain the online application system.   SEC. 2.   Section 11547.5 is added to the   Government Code   , to read:   11547.5. The State Chief Information Officer shall collaborate with the Department of Consumer Affairs to acquire a new, integrated, enterprise-wide enforcement and licensing system that will replace the current licensing and monitoring system being used by the department. The new system shall be Web based and may include applicant tracking, licensing, renewal, enforcement, monitoring, cashiering, and data management capabilities.