|
08/30/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Hernandez.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5419.).
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From inactive file. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Block.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 3036.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|