LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA13
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA13
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA13
Compare Versions
ACA13 Amended June 1, 2010
ACA13 Amended September 4, 2009
ACA13 Amended August 31, 2009
ACA13 Amended June 28, 2009
ACA13 Amended June 16, 2009
ACA13 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
ACA13 Amended June 1, 2010
ACA13 Amended September 4, 2009
ACA13 Amended August 31, 2009
ACA13 Amended June 28, 2009
ACA13 Amended June 16, 2009
ACA13 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare