|
10/13/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment. (Corrected October 12.)
|
|
|
|
10/08/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 5251.)
|
|
|
|
10/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. Art. IV, Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution suspended. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5243.) Read second time. To third reading. Read third time.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2010
|
Assembly Rule 96(b) suspended. (Page 7117.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 7117.). Read third time, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 7117.)
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. (Corrected May 24.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
12/08/2008
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/04/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
|
12/03/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|