LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA4
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA4
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 3, 2008
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
October 11, 2010
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 13, 2010
Compare
Amended
Bill
October 7, 2010
Compare
Bill
May 10, 2010
Compare
Bill
April 12, 2010
Compare
Bill
March 17, 2010
Compare