|
08/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6226.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 4454.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4724.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|