California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR102 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/30/2010

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 102CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 107 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 30, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Coto (Principal coauthor: Senator Alquist) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Ruskin) JANUARY 6, 2010 Relative to the Joe Colla Interchange. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 102, Coto. Joe Colla Interchange. This measure would designate the interchange of State Highway Routes 680, 280, and 101 in the City of San Jose as the Joe Colla Interchange. The measure would also request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Joseph Anthony Colla actively served the San Jose community during the 1970s as a pharmacist, bike racer, bike race promoter, and San Jose City Council Member; and WHEREAS, Councilman Joe Colla worked in the 1970s alongside future mayors Norman Mineta and Janet Gray Hayes to help the City of San Jose develop economically and culturally and become described as "San Jose, a City with a Future"; and WHEREAS, Councilman Joe Colla became a true urban legend when he arranged for a helicopter to lift a Chevy on top of an unfinished and abandoned interchange that had for four years fallen victim to the state's budget woes and a gasoline shortage; and WHEREAS, As a direct result of Councilman Joe Colla's exploits, including posing the question, "Where do I drive from here?" from atop the unfinished interchange, and identifying the monolith as "A Monument to Nowhere," the City of San Jose received the necessary funding and the interchange project was completed; and WHEREAS, It is accordingly appropriate to designate the interchange of State Highway Routes 680, 280, and 101 in the City of San Jose as the Joe Colla Interchange; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Joe Colla, a California leader whose actions ensured the completion of the interchange of State Highway Routes 680, 280, and 101 in the City of San Jose; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature hereby designates the interchange of State Highway Routes 680, 280, and 101 in the City of San Jose as the Joe Colla Interchange; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing the special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.