06/02/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/02/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
05/27/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
05/27/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3627.) | |||
05/25/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/24/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar. | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |||
04/29/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/19/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/19/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4724.) | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 14). | |||
03/23/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 22). | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/16/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/12/2010 | Introduced. To print. |