California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR122 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/02/2010

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 122CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 32 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 2, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JUNE 2, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Logue FEBRUARY 12, 2010 Relative to the Eric W. Rood Memorial Expressway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 122, Logue. Eric W. Rood Memorial Expressway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 20 in Nevada County as the Eric W. Rood Memorial Expressway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Eric W. Rood was a California native who graduated from California State University at Sacramento, and furthered his education by receiving a master's degree in management from George Washington University. He also graduated from the Air War College and Harvard Business School; and WHEREAS, Eric W. Rood enlisted in the United States Air Force in 1942. He earned his wings and commission in mid-1943 and went on to complete an honorable tour of military service. Thereafter, he taught at the Bombardier School at Mather Air Force Base near Sacramento before being deployed to the Philippines for three years. He retired from the Air Force as a colonel in 1973 at McClellan Air Force Base. While stationed with the Pentagon, he played a role in bringing a missile program to Beale Air Force Base; and WHEREAS, Eric W. Rood served as Nevada County's 4th District Supervisor from 1975 to 1986, inclusive, including two terms as chair; and WHEREAS, As Nevada County's 4th District Supervisor, Eric W. Rood was instrumental in securing state funding for the State Highway Route 20 bypass between Grass Valley and Penn Valley. Today, the highway is a busy thoroughfare that has been critical to growth and economic development in Penn Valley; and WHEREAS, Eric W. Rood worked with the state for more than two decades to resolve the many special problems faced by the rural communities of Nevada County; and WHEREAS, While serving as a county supervisor, Eric W. Rood was president of the state's powerful Regional Council of Rural Counties, director of the County Supervisor's Association of California, vice chairman of the California Local Agency Formation Commission, and served on the board of the Sierra Economic Development District, the Sierra Planning Organization, and the Foothill Strategy Advisory Committee. He also served on the Nevada County local agency formation commission, the Golden Chain Council of the Mother Lode, the Foothill Airport Land Use Commission, Mountain County Air Basin, the Area 4 Agency on Aging, and the Foothill Strategy Advisory Committee. He was a founder of the Western Gateway Recreation and Park District that helped build Western Gateway Park in Penn Valley and he was also a member of various other organizations; and WHEREAS, Eric W. Rood retired in January 1987 and passed away in 1998; and WHEREAS, It is a fitting tribute to recognize the contributions of Eric W. Rood to the people of California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates State Highway Route 20 between its junction with State Highway Route 49 and the intersection of the Rough and Ready Highway and Penn Valley Drive, in Nevada County, as the Eric W. Rood Memorial Expressway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.