|
09/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6600.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4771.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). (Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14).)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5508.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|