LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR138
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR138
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR138
Compare Versions
ACR138 Chaptered September 9, 2010
ACR138 Enrolled September 2, 2010
ACR138 Amended July 15, 2010
ACR138 Amended May 28, 2010
ACR138 Introduced February 23, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
ACR138 Chaptered September 9, 2010
ACR138 Enrolled September 2, 2010
ACR138 Amended July 15, 2010
ACR138 Amended May 28, 2010
ACR138 Introduced February 23, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare