09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/26/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4942.) | |||
05/03/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/29/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4936.) | |||
04/26/2010 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |||
04/12/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/08/2010 | From printer. | |||
04/07/2010 | Introduced. To print. |