BILL NUMBER: ACR 152CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 150 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 14, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 14, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 26, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hernandez (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bill Berryhill, Fletcher, Jeffries, Adams, Ammiano, Anderson, Arambula, Beall, Tom Berryhill, Blakeslee, Block, Blumenfield, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Charles Calderon, Carter, Chesbro, Conway, Cook, Coto, Davis, De La Torre, De Leon, DeVore, Emmerson, Eng, Evans, Feuer, Fong, Fuentes, Fuller, Furutani, Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gilmore, Hagman, Hall, Hayashi, Hill, Huber, Huffman, Lieu, Logue, Ma, Mendoza, Miller, Monning, Nestande, Niello, Nielsen, John A. Perez, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Ruskin, Salas, Saldana, Silva, Skinner, Solorio, Audra Strickland, Swanson, Torlakson, Torres, Tran, Villines, and Yamada) APRIL 7, 2010 Relative to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 152, Hernandez. Vehicles: automotive aftermarket: National Car Care Month. This measure would recognize the contributions of the automotive aftermarket to the state and consumers and its efforts to educate the motoring public about the benefits of proper vehicle maintenance. The measure also would recognize and support the designation of April as National Car Care Month and encourage all citizens to participate in activities that promote proper vehicle maintenance. WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket encompasses all products and services purchased for light- and heavy-duty vehicles after the original sale of the vehicle, including new, recycled, and remanufactured replacement parts, accessories, lubricants, appearance products, tires, collision repairs, service repairs, and the tools and equipment necessary to make the repairs, as well as vehicle end-of-life handling issues; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket is a significant sector of the United States economy and also is a vital and steady component of California's economy with annual aftermarket sales in California of approximately thirty-four billion five hundred million dollars ($34,500,000,000); and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket employed approximately 4,300,000 people nationally in 2008, and, of that amount, employs approximately 220,000 people in nearly 24,000 parts, warehouse, distributor, and retail establishments statewide; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket supplies the products and services that are fundamental to the proper maintenance and repair of more than 29,000,000 vehicles in California; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket supplies and serves more than 40,000 auto repair dealers that repair and service over 70 percent of California's vehicles; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket historically leads the world in innovation for service equipment, repair procedures, maintenance programs, and safety equipment for the state's and nation's fleet of vehicles; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket promotes a long-running sustainable practice of recycling and utilizing remanufactured and recycled automobile parts to conserve materials and energy; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket contributes to greenhouse gas reductions and the state's overall climate change goals by fostering awareness that a well-maintained vehicle leads to lower tailpipe emissions, and by advocating for a robust automotive aftermarket that is essential for keeping vehicles clean, well-maintained, and running efficiently and safely; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket provides consumers with choices for high-quality and affordable replacement parts and service for their vehicles, and also provides consumers with options for where they can purchase their parts and have their vehicles repaired; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket gives motorists options for repairing their vehicles in communities where dealerships have closed or in rural parts of the state where there is no dealership within close range; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket provides high-quality automobile replacement parts; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket is committed to providing parts and service options and choices so that proper vehicle maintenance and repairs are available to all socioeconomic levels of society, improving fuel efficiency, gas mileage, and safety for vehicles of all ages; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket strongly promotes career and technical education options for students in high school and community college in order to provide an educated workforce with the increased technical skills needed to maintain advanced vehicle systems; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket gives back to the community by providing educational scholarships to students pursuing careers in the automotive industry; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket believes in continuing education and training for the industry and supports technician testing programs; and WHEREAS, The automotive aftermarket is committed to educating motorists about the benefits of regular vehicle care, maintenance, and repair to ensure that vehicles are safer, more dependable and fuel efficient, and run more cleanly, by participating in consumer awareness initiatives like the Car Care Council's "Be Car Care Aware" campaign and the designation of April as National Car Care Month; and WHEREAS, The "Be Car Care Aware" campaign and National Car Care Month are the automotive aftermarket's collective effort to reach out to motorists and impart an understanding and appreciation of the personal and societal importance of proper vehicle maintenance; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the considerable contribution of the automotive aftermarket to the state's economy, transportation system, and environmental stewardship, while also providing robust consumer choices for the transportation needs of all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes and applauds the automotive aftermarket's efforts through the "Be Car Care Aware" campaign and National Car Care Month to educate the motoring public about the importance of vehicle safety and environmental stewardship facilitated by proper vehicle maintenance; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes and supports the designation of April as National Car Care Month and encourages all citizens to participate in activities that promote proper vehicle maintenance; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.