09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/26/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4943.) | |||
05/11/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/10/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5077.) (Corrected May 11.) | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). | |||
04/19/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/14/2010 | From printer. | |||
04/13/2010 | Introduced. To print. |