California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR157 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/14/2010

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 157CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 151 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 14, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 14, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 26, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 10, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 10, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fong (Coauthors: Assembly Members Eng, Furutani, Hayashi, Lieu, Ma, Torrico, Yamada, Adams, Ammiano, Anderson, Arambula, Bass, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Tom Berryhill, Blakeslee, Block, Blumenfield, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Caballero, Charles Calderon, Carter, Chesbro, Conway, Cook, Coto, Davis, De Leon, Emmerson, Evans, Feuer, Fletcher, Fuentes, Fuller, Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gilmore, Hagman, Hall, Hernandez, Hill, Huber, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Miller, Monning, Nava, Nestande, Niello, Nielsen, John A. Perez, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Ruskin, Salas, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Audra Strickland, Swanson, Torres, Tran, and Villines) (Coauthor: Senator Yee) APRIL 13, 2010 Relative to Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 157, Fong. Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month. This measure would recognize May 2010 as Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month. WHEREAS, The earliest Asian Americans immigrated to the United States in the 1800s; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander Americans have played a critical role in the social, economic, and political development of California throughout its history; and WHEREAS, The five million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans in California are one of the fastest growing ethnic populations in the state; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander Americans represent over 14 percent of California's population and represent ancestries that include Burmese, Cambodian, Chinese, Asian Indian, Filipino, Guamanian, Hawaiian, Hmong, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Samoan, Singaporean, Thai, Tongan, and Vietnamese; and WHEREAS, The California Commission on Asian and Pacific Islander American Affairs was established in 2004 and is charged with advising the Governor, the Legislature, and state agencies on issues relating to the social and economic development, rights, and interests of the Asian and Pacific Islander American communities; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander American entrepreneurs have led many of California's businesses to the pinnacle of their respective industries; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander American communities throughout California actively promote their cultural heritage and promote cross-cultural understanding; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander Americans will continue to be an important part of California's diverse tapestry of cultures and ideas; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander Americans have contributed greatly to California's economic success, rural growth, and urban development; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander Americans continue to cultivate and advance the fields of the arts and humanities, business, education, information technology, law, public safety, science, sports, and the environment; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander American refugees have revitalized many of California's communities, while bringing in new ideas and economic opportunities; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander American immigrants and refugees had to overcome tremendous odds and cultural barriers to establish a better life for their families; and WHEREAS, Asian and Pacific Islander Americans have a proud legacy of service and dedication to the state and to the United States; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature commends Asian and Pacific Islander Americans for their notable accomplishments and outstanding service to the state, and recognizes the month of May 2010 as Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.