09/10/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/10/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | |||
08/24/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/24/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4823.) | |||
08/20/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/02/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/02/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6005.) | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 30). | |||
06/10/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 7). | |||
05/25/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
05/24/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | |||
04/22/2010 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
04/20/2010 | From printer. | |||
04/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |